AL HB363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 5 municipality, organized under Chapter 43D, Code of Alabama 1975, (Bessemer) city council, clerical assistants auth., Sec. 11-43D-14 am'd.
Title
Class 5 municipality, organized under Chapter 43D, Code of Alabama 1975, (Bessemer) city council, clerical assistants auth., Sec. 11-43D-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 455 |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Rereferred from Local Legislation to Jefferson County Legislation |
2017-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |