AL HB363 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Class 5 municipality, organized under Chapter 43D, Code of Alabama 1975, (Bessemer) city council, clerical assistants auth., Sec. 11-43D-14 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class 5 municipality, organized under Chapter 43D, Code of Alabama 1975, (Bessemer) city council, clerical assistants auth., Sec. 11-43D-14 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2017-04-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 455
2017-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-09HouseRereferred from Local Legislation to Jefferson County Legislation
2017-03-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback