AL HB362 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Lost in house of origin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Forever Wild Land Trust, ad valorem tax revenue lost on property acquired, reimbursement payments from trust to all entities previously receiving tax revenue, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forever Wild Land Trust, ad valorem tax revenue lost on property acquired, reimbursement payments from trust to all entities previously receiving tax revenue, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Rogers motion to reconsider (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Rogers motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 12 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseLost in house of origin
2018-03-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 588
2018-03-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 587
2018-03-01HouseTuggle Amendment #2 Offered
2018-03-01HouseRogers motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call
2018-03-01HouseRogers motion to Suspend Rules adopted Roll Call 585
2018-03-01HouseRogers notice in writing filed
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 497
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 496
2018-02-27HouseTuggle Amendment #1 Offered
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 495
2018-02-27HouseState Government first Substitute Offered
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-02-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB362&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB362-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191241-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590939&VOTE=495&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591067&VOTE=496&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591070&VOTE=497&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592281&VOTE=587&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592282&VOTE=588&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592275&VOTE=585&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592276&VOTE=586&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592773&VOTE=606&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback