AL HB362 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Governor at 4:10 p.m. on May 20, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Delivered to Governor at 4:10 p.m. on May 20, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, Risk Manager and Finance Director to develop program to reconstruct certain destroyed buildings with materials superior to original, Sec. 41-15-4 am'd.
Title
Insurance, Risk Manager and Finance Director to develop program to reconstruct certain destroyed buildings with materials superior to original, Sec. 41-15-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:10 p.m. on May 20, 2014. |
2014-03-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-261. |
2014-03-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1007 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2014-02-18 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-18 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 353 |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 352 |
2014-02-18 | House | McClurkin Amendment Offered |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 351 |
2014-02-18 | House | Buskey Amendment Offered |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 350 |
2014-02-18 | House | Poole Amendment Offered |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |