AL HB361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Transportation and Energy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Transportation and Energy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Roads and bridges, correct technical revision of Act 2017-375, provide for suspension of vehicle registration for unpaid toll violation, Secs. 23-2-167, 23-2-168, 23-2-169, 23-2-172, 23-2-173, 23-2-175 am'd.
Title
Roads and bridges, correct technical revision of Act 2017-375, provide for suspension of vehicle registration for unpaid toll violation, Secs. 23-2-167, 23-2-168, 23-2-169, 23-2-172, 23-2-173, 23-2-175 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Transportation and Energy |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2018-02-27 | House | Engrossed |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 493 |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 492 |
2018-02-27 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2018-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |