AL HB36 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms, to prohibit parts converting a firearm into a machine gun
Title
Firearms, to prohibit parts converting a firearm into a machine gun
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 946 (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 944 4JFSRRI-1 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 943 2AW4KKS-1 (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 940 Q6L2545-1 (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 944 4JFSRRI-1 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 943 2AW4KKS-1 (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 940 Q6L2545-1 (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 946 |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 944 4JFSRRI-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Stringer 1st Amendment Offered 4JFSRRI-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 943 2AW4KKS-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Ensler 1st Amendment Offered 2AW4KKS-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered D5SQTTH-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Judiciary 1st Substitute Offered W83C9E9-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 940 Q6L2545-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered Q6L2545-1 |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted Q6L2545-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted D5SQTTH-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted W83C9E9-1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled |