AL HB359 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal justice agencies, required to submit reports concerning reported and unreported sexual assault cases
Title
Criminal justice agencies, required to submit reports concerning reported and unreported sexual assault cases
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 752 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 751 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 751 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 752 |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |