AL HB359 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Delivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Marion Co., judge of probate, compensation on salary basis, one-stop issuance of motor vehicle plates, duties of revenue commissioner transferred, fees paid to probate court

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marion Co., judge of probate, compensation on salary basis, one-stop issuance of motor vehicle plates, duties of revenue commissioner transferred, fees paid to probate court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Millican motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 66 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
2017-04-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-234.
2017-04-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-04-27SenateSignature Requested
2017-04-27SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-04-25HouseEnrolled
2017-04-25HouseMillican motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 620
2017-04-25HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 580
2017-04-13SenateBussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 579
2017-04-13SenateLocal Legislation Amendment Offered
2017-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-11SenateBussman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-11SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-04-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-03-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2017-03-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 244
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback