AL HB359 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1485
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic poll books in lieu of printed lists of qualified voters at polling place, Sec. of State authorized to implement pilot program, Sec. 17-4-2.1 added; Sec. 17-4-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic poll books in lieu of printed lists of qualified voters at polling place, Sec. of State authorized to implement pilot program, Sec. 17-4-2.1 added; Sec. 17-4-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 4 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 83) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Polizos motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1485
2015-06-04SenateLost in second house
2015-06-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-06-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
2015-05-14HouseEngrossed
2015-05-14HouseCosponsors Added
2015-05-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 750
2015-05-14HousePolizos motion to Table adopted Roll Call 749
2015-05-14HouseKnight Amendment Offered
2015-05-14HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 748
2015-05-14HouseDrummond Amendment Offered
2015-05-14HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 747
2015-05-14HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections first Substitute Offered
2015-05-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-30HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-03-31HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB359
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB359-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB359-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=518260&VOTE=747&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=518279&VOTE=748&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=518285&VOTE=749&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=518299&VOTE=750&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=518301&VOTE=751&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526500&VOTE=1485&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback