AL HB359 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Washington Co., sheriff, impoundment of motor vehicle used to transport drugs, fee, deposit, expenditure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington Co., sheriff, impoundment of motor vehicle used to transport drugs, fee, deposit, expenditure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 14) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseForwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-299.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HousePassed Second House
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1051
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-09SenateDial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 935
2013-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2013-04-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 509
2013-04-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-03-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-28HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback