AL HB359 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 2, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Corporations, Foreign, provided with same obligations, rights, and consequences as other foreign entities doing business unregistered, Sec. 10A-1-7.21 am'd; Secs. 10A-2-15.01, 10A-2-15.02 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations, Foreign, provided with same obligations, rights, and consequences as other foreign entities doing business unregistered, Sec. 10A-1-7.21 am'd; Secs. 10A-2-15.01, 10A-2-15.02 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-04 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-02 Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 2, 2012.
2012-05-02 Assigned Act No. 2012-304 on 05/09/2012.
2012-05-02 Enrolled
2012-05-02 Signature Requested
2012-05-02 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-02 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-02 DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1164
2012-05-02 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-01 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 876
2012-05-01 Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 875
2012-05-01 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2012-05-01 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-12 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-03-22 Re-referred to Committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections.
2012-03-15 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Business and Labor
2012-03-15 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364
2012-03-15 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB359
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB359-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB359-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431346&VOTE=364&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=442729&VOTE=875&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=442730&VOTE=876&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=443281&VOTE=1164&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback