AL HB359 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lee Co., constable, office abolished

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lee Co., constable, office abolished

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 25) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-02 Further Consideration
2011-06-02 Dial motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2011-06-02 Third Reading Carried Over
2011-06-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-05-31 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2011-05-31 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 942
2011-05-31 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-26 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-29 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Lee County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback