AL HB354 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mobile Co., Revenue Commissioner's office, salary of executive secretary and chief clerk, Act 81-508, 1981 Reg. Sess., repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile Co., Revenue Commissioner's office, salary of executive secretary and chief clerk, Act 81-508, 1981 Reg. Sess., repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 62 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseForwarded to Executive Department
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-365.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1034
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-21SenateGlover motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-19SenateGlover motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2016-04-12SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County
2016-04-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 471
2016-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback