AL HB354 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Job Creation and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Beer, cider, and wine, homebrewing in limited amounts by person 21 years of age or older for personal use authorized without taxation or licensure, penalties, convicted felon prohibited from homebrewing (2012-20414)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beer, cider, and wine, homebrewing in limited amounts by person 21 years of age or older for personal use authorized without taxation or licensure, penalties, convicted felon prohibited from homebrewing (2012-20414)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - McCutcheon motion to Adopt (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 51 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Job Creation and Economic Development
2012-05-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-02 Re-referred to Committee on Job Creation and Economic Development
2012-04-26 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Small Business
2012-04-26 Engrossed
2012-04-26 Boman and Givan intended to vote "Abstatin" and Buskey intended to vote "Yea"
2012-04-26 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1026
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1025
2012-04-26 Laird 2nd Amendment Offered
2012-04-26 Oden motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Voice Vote
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1024
2012-04-26 Bridges 2nd Amendment Offered
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1023
2012-04-26 Buttram Amendment Offered
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1022
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1019
2012-04-26 Laird 1st Amendment Offered
2012-04-26 Economic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered
2012-04-26 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1021
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2012-04-26 Bridges 1st Amendment Offered
2012-04-26 Third Reading Carried Over
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1020
2012-04-26 Wallace Amendment Offered
2012-04-26 McCutcheon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2012-04-26 Economic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered
2012-04-26 Third Reading Carried Over
2012-03-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2012-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB354
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB354-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB354-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441541&VOTE=1020&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441589&VOTE=1021&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441630&VOTE=1022&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441447&VOTE=1019&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441677&VOTE=1023&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441692&VOTE=1024&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441702&VOTE=1025&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441703&VOTE=1026&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback