AL HB354 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, reopened for purchase of prior service credit for service with United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency (2010-20304)
Title
Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, reopened for purchase of prior service credit for service with United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency (2010-20304)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Further Consideration | |
2010-04-22 | Barron motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 464 | |
2010-03-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 463 | |
2010-03-02 | Government Operations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Operations |