AL HB353 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appellate procedure, certain legislative entities and officers authorized to file amicus briefs in appeals
Title
Appellate procedure, certain legislative entities and officers authorized to file amicus briefs in appeals
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Rowe motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-443. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Rowe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1101 |
2019-05-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1233 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1232 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 799 |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |