AL HB353 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, counties and muns. were authorized, authorized to sell after 10 am where authorized by co. commission or city council, referendum under certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, counties and muns. were authorized, authorized to sell after 10 am where authorized by co. commission or city council, referendum under certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Givan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - Givan motion to Table (Y: 32 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - Ford motion to Previous Question (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 55) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 36 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - Givan motion to Table (Y: 38 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-444.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseScott motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1037
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1299
2017-05-19SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1298
2017-05-19SenateTourism and Marketing Amendment Offered
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
2017-04-25HouseEngrossed
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 634
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 633
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 632
2017-04-25HouseGivan motion to Table lost Roll Call 631
2017-04-25HouseClouse motion to reconsider offered
2017-04-25HouseFord motion to Previous Question lost Roll Call 630
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt lost Roll Call 629
2017-04-25HouseGivan motion to Table lost Roll Call 628
2017-04-25HouseClouse Amendment Offered
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB353&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB353-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB353-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185873-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571198&VOTE=628&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571199&VOTE=629&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571200&VOTE=630&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571203&VOTE=631&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571204&VOTE=632&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571210&VOTE=633&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571211&VOTE=634&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579092&VOTE=1298&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579093&VOTE=1299&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579259&VOTE=1037&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback