AL HB352 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 5:43 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contracts, use of restrictive covenants clarified, Sec. 8-1-1 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts, use of restrictive covenants clarified, Sec. 8-1-1 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:43 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-465.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04HouseEnrolled
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-04HousePassed Second House
2015-06-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1493
2015-06-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2015-05-19HouseEngrossed
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 912
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 911
2015-05-19HouseEngland Amendment Offered
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 910
2015-05-19HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 909
2015-05-19HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2015-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2015-03-31HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB352
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB352-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB352-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB352-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519742&VOTE=909&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519743&VOTE=910&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519745&VOTE=911&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519746&VOTE=912&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526548&VOTE=1493&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback