AL HB352 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on HB352 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Class 3 municipalities, tax sale properties acquired from State Land Commissioner, procedure to quiet title in lieu of procedures in Title 40, Chapter 10, Code of Alabama 1975

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class 3 municipalities, tax sale properties acquired from State Land Commissioner, procedure to quiet title in lieu of procedures in Title 40, Chapter 10, Code of Alabama 1975

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Hubbard (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Hubbard (J) motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - House - Hubbard (J) motion to Table (Y: 58 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Conference Committee on HB352 2012RS first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-517.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Concurred in Conference Report
2012-05-16 Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1565
2012-05-16 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Hubbard (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1594
2012-05-16 Conference Report
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Appointed
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1443 P&PO appoints Orr, Brewbaker and Ross
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Requested
2012-05-16 Hubbard (J) motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1542 House appoints Hubbard (J), Davis and Harper
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1345
2012-05-10 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-10 Orr Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2012-05-10 Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1331
2012-05-10 Orr first Substitute Offered
2012-05-10 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-04-17 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-20 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2012-03-15 Engrossed
2012-03-15 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 384
2012-03-15 Hubbard (J) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 383
2012-03-15 Bracy Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 382
2012-03-15 County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB352
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB352-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB352-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB352-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431512&VOTE=382&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431537&VOTE=383&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431542&VOTE=384&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448705&VOTE=1331&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448843&VOTE=1345&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449821&VOTE=1542&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450050&VOTE=1443&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450777&VOTE=1594&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450998&VOTE=1565&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback