AL HB351 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Forwarded to Governor on April 30, 2015 at 2:05 p.m. on April 30, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Forwarded to Governor on April 30, 2015 at 2:05 p.m. on April 30, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., sheriff, inmate trust account, use of funds for law enforcement purposes
Title
Jackson Co., sheriff, inmate trust account, use of funds for law enforcement purposes
Sponsors
Rep. James Hanes [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 30, 2015 at 2:05 p.m. on April 30, 2015. |
2015-04-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-118. |
2015-04-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-04-30 | House | Enrolled |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 667 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 263 |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |