AL HB350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Examiners of Public Accounts Department, placed in Office of State Auditor, appointment of Chief Examiner of the department, Secs. 36-16-1, 41-5-1, 41-5-3, 41-5-6, 41-5-6.1, 41-5-7, 41-5-8, 41-5-10 am'd; Secs. 41-5-4, 41-5-5, 41-5-9, 41-5-18, 41-5-19, 41-5-20 repealed
Title
Examiners of Public Accounts Department, placed in Office of State Auditor, appointment of Chief Examiner of the department, Secs. 36-16-1, 41-5-1, 41-5-3, 41-5-6, 41-5-6.1, 41-5-7, 41-5-8, 41-5-10 am'd; Secs. 41-5-4, 41-5-5, 41-5-9, 41-5-18, 41-5-19, 41-5-20 repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Ken Johnson [R] | Rep. William Roberts [R] | Sen. Donnie Chesteen [R] |
Rep. Richard Baughn [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Sen. April Weaver [R] | Rep. Alan Harper [R] |
Rep. Mac Buttram [R] | Rep. Mack Butler [R] | Rep. Mike Hubbard [R] | Rep. Wes Long [R] |
Rep. Dan Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-13 | House | Mitchell dissent filed |
2014-03-13 | House | Grimsley conflict of interest declaration filed |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 775 |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 774 |
2014-03-13 | House | Laird Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 773 |
2014-03-13 | House | Hill Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 769 |
2014-03-13 | House | Henry first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 772 |
2014-03-13 | House | W&MGF 3rd Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 771 |
2014-03-13 | House | W&MGF 2nd Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 770 |
2014-03-13 | House | W&MGF 1st Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Gaston motion to recess adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | House | Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 768 |
2014-03-13 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 3 amendments |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |