AL HB35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacists, collaborative practice agreements with a physician, agreements to be submitted to Bd. of Pharmacy and St. Bd. of Medical Examiners, Sec. 34-23-77 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists, collaborative practice agreements with a physician, agreements to be submitted to Bd. of Pharmacy and St. Bd. of Medical Examiners, Sec. 34-23-77 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
2019-05-30HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-368.
2019-05-30HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-30SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-29HouseEnrolled
2019-05-29HousePassed Second House
2019-05-29SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1348
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed
2019-04-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 282
2019-04-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 281
2019-04-18HouseInsurance first Substitute Offered
2019-04-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-03-05HouseRereferred from Health to Insurance
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB35&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB35-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB35-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB35-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198596-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=611624&VOTE=281&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=611625&VOTE=282&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=625752&VOTE=1348&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback