AL HB35 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on March 8, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, sales and use tax, certain tax-exempt public water and sewer authorities, districts, boards, and systems eligible as government entities for certificates of exemptions from the Dept. of Revenue, Sec. 40-9-14.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, sales and use tax, certain tax-exempt public water and sewer authorities, districts, boards, and systems eligible as government entities for certificates of exemptions from the Dept. of Revenue, Sec. 40-9-14.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on March 8, 2018.
2018-03-08HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-234.
2018-03-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-08SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06HousePassed Second House
2018-03-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 653
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2018-02-06HouseEngrossed
2018-02-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 215
2018-02-06HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 214
2018-02-06HouseCrawford Amendment Offered
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback