AL HB35 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-15 - Forwarded to Executive Department on September 15, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coffee Co.,county officers, including county commissioners, sheriff, coroner, revenue commissioner, and judge of probate, compensation, Secs. 45-16-60, 45-16-84 repealed; Secs. 45-16-62, 45-16-84.01, 45-16-84.02, 45-16-230 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coffee Co.,county officers, including county commissioners, sheriff, coroner, revenue commissioner, and judge of probate, compensation, Secs. 45-16-60, 45-16-84 repealed; Secs. 45-16-62, 45-16-84.01, 45-16-84.02, 45-16-230 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 28) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-15HouseForwarded to Executive Department on September 15, 2015
2015-09-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-552.
2015-09-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-15HouseEnrolled
2015-09-15SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-15HousePassed Second House
2015-09-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39
2015-09-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-09-11HouseEngrossed
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 33
2015-09-11HouseMoore (B) Amendment Offered
2015-09-11HouseMoore (B) motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24
2015-09-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback