AL HB349 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Assigned Act No. - on 05/26/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Assigned Act No. - on 05/26/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial Preservation Act, monuments prohibited from relocation or removal, Alabama Committee on Memorial Preservation created
Title
Memorial Preservation Act, monuments prohibited from relocation or removal, Alabama Committee on Memorial Preservation created
Sponsors
Rep. Mack Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. - on 05/26/2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |