AL HB349 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tax sale property, redemption, payment of excess to persons negotiating redemption or purchasing at a tax sale, further provided for, Sec. 40-10-28 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax sale property, redemption, payment of excess to persons negotiating redemption or purchasing at a tax sale, further provided for, Sec. 40-10-28 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-442.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1155
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-04-01HouseEngrossed
2014-04-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2014-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1047
2014-04-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1046
2014-04-01HouseHill Amendment Offered
2014-04-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1045
2014-04-01HouseCounty and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2014-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-12HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-01-22HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB349
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB349-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB349-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB349-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=498653&VOTE=1045&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=498655&VOTE=1046&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=498656&VOTE=1047&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500142&VOTE=1155&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback