AL HB349 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Railroads, Mississippi-Louisiana-Alabama Rapid Rail Transit Commission, name changed to Southern High-Speed Rail Commission, Sec. 37-11-1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroads, Mississippi-Louisiana-Alabama Rapid Rail Transit Commission, name changed to Southern High-Speed Rail Commission, Sec. 37-11-1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-700 on 04/29/2010.
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Passed Second House
2010-04-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1237
2010-04-22 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-30 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
2010-04-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-03-25 Engrossed
2010-03-25 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 672
2010-03-25 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 671
2010-03-25 Boards and Commissions first Substitute Offered
2010-03-25 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-01-19 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB349
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/HB349-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/HB349-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/HB349-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=380891&VOTE=671&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=380892&VOTE=672&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=392170&VOTE=1237&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback