AL HB348 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hospitals, private hospital assessment for Medicaid extended, including intergovernmental transfers, Secs. 40-26B-70, 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-75, 40-26B-76, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals, private hospital assessment for Medicaid extended, including intergovernmental transfers, Secs. 40-26B-70, 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-75, 40-26B-76, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-382.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1323
2017-05-19HousePassed Second House
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-17SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2017-03-14HouseEngrossed
2017-03-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 276
2017-03-14HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 275
2017-03-14HouseClouse Amendment Offered
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback