AL HB348 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grandparents, definition to include parent of a parent of a minor child, including an adopted child, visitation with minor child, considerations of court in determining best interests of child, Sec. 30-3-4.1 am'd.
Title
Grandparents, definition to include parent of a parent of a minor child, including an adopted child, visitation with minor child, considerations of court in determining best interests of child, Sec. 30-3-4.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Shiver motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:00 p.m. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-562. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Shiver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1116 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 972 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 971 | |
2011-06-02 | Pittman Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 970 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-02 | Pittman Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-05-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-19 | Cosponsors Added | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 334 | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 333 | |
2011-04-19 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 332 | |
2011-04-19 | JUDY 1st Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |