AL HB346 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Alabama Workforce Housing Tax Credit Act; creates the Alabama Workforce Housing Tax Credit
Title
Establishes the Alabama Workforce Housing Tax Credit Act; creates the Alabama Workforce Housing Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 672 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 671 V3Q4VVV-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 671 V3Q4VVV-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-18 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 672 |
2024-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 671 V3Q4VVV-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Ways and Means Education Engrossed Substitute Offered V3Q4VVV-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Ways and Means Education V3Q4VVV-1 |
2024-04-10 | House | Ways and Means Education 1st Amendment XJWIE7Z-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |