AL HB346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:39 p.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:39 p.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Social Work Examiners, Board of, license verification, fees, Sec. 34-30-57 am'd.
Title
Social Work Examiners, Board of, license verification, fees, Sec. 34-30-57 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Van Smith [R] | Rep. Kelvin Lawrence [D] | Rep. Charlotte Meadows [R] | Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
Rep. Jeff Sorrells [R] | Rep. Shane Stringer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1154 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1153 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 697 (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 696 (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Smith motion to Adopt Roll Call 695 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 1153 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 697 (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 696 (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Smith motion to Adopt Roll Call 695 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:39 p.m. on April 22, 2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-315. |
2021-04-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1154 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-04-07 | House | Engrossed |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 697 |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 696 |
2021-04-07 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Chambliss motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote