AL HB345 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Historic buildings, income tax credit authorized for rehabilitation of qualified structures, standards by Historical Commission, rules, approval by Historic Tax Credit Evaluating Committee estab., limitations, expiration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic buildings, income tax credit authorized for rehabilitation of qualified structures, standards by Historical Commission, rules, approval by Historic Tax Credit Evaluating Committee estab., limitations, expiration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Gaston motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-380.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseGaston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1002
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 963
2017-05-09SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 962
2017-05-09SenateFinance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2017-05-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-04-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2017-04-18HouseEngrossed
2017-04-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 546
2017-04-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 545
2017-04-18HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2017-04-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-03-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB345&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB345-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184649-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569688&VOTE=545&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569691&VOTE=546&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=575365&VOTE=962&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=575366&VOTE=963&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578765&VOTE=1002&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback