AL HB343 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Financial Services first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Financial Services first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Real property, mortgages, foreclosures, redemption limited for property other than agriculture and forestry property, reduced, Sec. 6-5-248 am'd.
Title
Real property, mortgages, foreclosures, redemption limited for property other than agriculture and forestry property, reduced, Sec. 6-5-248 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Financial Services first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Financial Services with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2011-03-29 | Rereferred from Judiciary to Financial Services | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |