AL HB343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 2 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 2 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., sewer system, county commission to notify owners of property of delinquent sewer bill within 90 days, failure to notify makes bill uncollectible, const. amend.
Title
Jefferson Co., sewer system, county commission to notify owners of property of delinquent sewer bill within 90 days, failure to notify makes bill uncollectible, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 15 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1072 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Newton (D) to temporarily carry over adopted voice vote | |
2010-04-13 | Newton (D) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-08 | Newton (D) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-06 | Newton (D) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Hammett motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 821 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |