AL HB341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Pending Senate Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Pending Senate Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin County, increases service of process fees
Title
Baldwin County, increases service of process fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 322 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 321 CNEHQWQ-1 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 321 CNEHQWQ-1 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-02 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 322 |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 321 CNEHQWQ-1 |
2024-04-02 | House | Baldwin County Legislation Engrossed Substitute Offered CNEHQWQ-1 |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Baldwin County Legislation CNEHQWQ-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Baldwin County Legislation 1st Amendment PYJPEGE-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Pending House Baldwin County Legislation |
2024-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Baldwin County Legislation |