AL HB340 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-11)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Conference Committee on HB340 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-11)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Conference Committee on HB340 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crime of Looting, established, penalties, violation would be Class C felony
Title
Crime of Looting, established, penalties, violation would be Class C felony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Merrill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Merrill motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Merrill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Merrill motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Conference Committee on HB340 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-316. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-05-03 | Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 939 | |
2012-05-03 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-02 | Merrill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1175 | |
2012-05-02 | Conference Report | |
2012-05-02 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-05-01 | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 858 P&PO appoints Allen, Fielding and Ward | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Merrill motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1071 House appoints Robinson (O), Farley and Merrill | |
2012-05-01 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 833 | |
2012-04-26 | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 832 | |
2012-04-26 | Singleton Amendment No. 2 Offered. | |
2012-04-26 | Singleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-26 | Singleton Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-03-20 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 401 | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |