AL HB34 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, driving without a license, penalties, Sec. 32-6-19 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, driving without a license, penalties, Sec. 32-6-19 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 47 N: 39 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Stadthagen motion to Table (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 47 N: 39 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Stadthagen motion to Table (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 253 |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 252 |
2020-03-10 | House | Wadsworth Amendment Offered |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 251 |
2020-03-10 | House | Chestnut 2nd Amendment Offered |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Stadthagen motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-05 | House | Chestnut motion to Withdraw his amendment #1 adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-05 | House | Stadthagen motion to Table lost Roll Call 231 |
2020-03-05 | House | Chestnut Amendment #1 Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 230 |
2020-03-05 | House | Harbison Amendment Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2020-02-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |