AL HB34 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Churches, use of deadly force authorized, in defense of self or others for certain crimes against church members or volunteers, Alabama Church Protection Act, Secs. 13A-3-20, 13A-3-23 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Churches, use of deadly force authorized, in defense of self or others for certain crimes against church members or volunteers, Alabama Church Protection Act, Secs. 13A-3-20, 13A-3-23 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 60 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateFurther Consideration
2018-03-22SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-22SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1071
2018-03-22SenateChambliss Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-22SenateHoltzclaw motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-02-15HouseEngrossed
2018-02-15HouseRowe Intended to vote "Yea"
2018-02-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 348
2018-02-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 347
2018-02-15HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-02-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB34&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB34-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190359-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588734&VOTE=346&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588734&VOTE=347&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588738&VOTE=348&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600267&VOTE=1071&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback