AL HB34 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Jefferson Co., cemetery board established, terms defined, members and duties, provided for, funding provided

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jefferson Co., cemetery board established, terms defined, members and duties, provided for, funding provided

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Givan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 29) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-439.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseGivan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1004
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1132
2017-05-17SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1131
2017-05-17SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1130
2017-05-17SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1129
2017-05-17SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1128
2017-05-17SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1127
2017-05-17SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1126
2017-05-17SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 6 amendments
2017-03-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
2017-03-07HouseEngrossed
2017-03-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 150
2017-03-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 149
2017-03-07HouseGivan Amendment #2 Offered
2017-03-07HouseGivan motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-02HouseGivan Notice in Writing filed
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 137
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 136
2017-03-02HouseGivan Amendment #1 Offered
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 135
2017-03-02HouseJefferson County Legislation Amendment #3 Offered
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 134
2017-03-02HouseJefferson County Legislation Amendment #2 Offered
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 133
2017-03-02HouseJefferson County Legislation Amendment #1 offered
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB34&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB34-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB34-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB34-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/182814-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/182925-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/182195-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183128-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183405-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186464-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186467-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186468-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186492-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184958-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186356-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561555&VOTE=133&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561560&VOTE=134&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561563&VOTE=135&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561584&VOTE=136&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561585&VOTE=137&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561980&VOTE=149&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561981&VOTE=150&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577269&VOTE=1126&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577271&VOTE=1127&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577272&VOTE=1128&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577273&VOTE=1129&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577274&VOTE=1130&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577275&VOTE=1131&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577276&VOTE=1132&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578774&VOTE=1004&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback