AL HB34 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distinctive tags, veterans, motorcycle available at same cost as car tag of same designation, Sec. 32-6-690 added
Title
Motor vehicles, distinctive tags, veterans, motorcycle available at same cost as car tag of same designation, Sec. 32-6-690 added
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Faust [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-04-28 | House | Engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554 |
2015-04-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 553 |
2015-04-28 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |