AL HB34 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Continuous sexual abuse of a person when first act of sexual conduct occurs when abused person is under age 12, crime of established, penalties (2012-20186R1)
Title
Continuous sexual abuse of a person when first act of sexual conduct occurs when abused person is under age 12, crime of established, penalties (2012-20186R1)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-22 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-22 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 516 | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 515 | |
2012-03-22 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |