AL HB34 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 14, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 14, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sickle Cell Oversight and Regulatory Commission, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2014
Title
Sickle Cell Oversight and Regulatory Commission, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 14, 2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2011-151. | |
2011-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2011-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2011-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 245 | |
2011-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92 | |
2011-03-29 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |