AL HB339 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement, amending definition of peace officer to include federal agent, Sec. 13A-10-11 am'd.
Title
Law enforcement, amending definition of peace officer to include federal agent, Sec. 13A-10-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 518 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 517 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Estes motion to Adopt Roll Call 516 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 517 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Estes motion to Adopt Roll Call 516 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 518 |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 517 |
2022-03-09 | House | Estes Amendment Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |