AL HB339 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:09 a. m. on April 26, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:09 a. m. on April 26, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor carrier transportation contracts, contracts by motor carriers and entities shipping may not limit liability for each party for their own negligence, exception, Sec. 37-3-23.1 added
Title
Motor carrier transportation contracts, contracts by motor carriers and entities shipping may not limit liability for each party for their own negligence, exception, Sec. 37-3-23.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Delivered to Governor at 10:09 a. m. on April 26, 2012. | |
2012-04-26 | Assigned Act No. 2012-277. | |
2012-04-26 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-26 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-24 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-24 | Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 944 | |
2012-04-24 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 727 | |
2012-04-24 | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 726 | |
2012-04-24 | Dial first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-24 | Dial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-24 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-05 | Bracy intended to vote Yea | |
2012-04-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 599 | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |