AL HB338 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Building Exceptional School Board Team Act (BEST), provides further for boardsmanship standards, training, and discipline of local bd. of education members, Sec. 16-1-41.1 repealed; Secs. 16-8-1, 16-11-2 am'd.
Title
Building Exceptional School Board Team Act (BEST), provides further for boardsmanship standards, training, and discipline of local bd. of education members, Sec. 16-1-41.1 repealed; Secs. 16-8-1, 16-11-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Estes [R] | Rep. Chip Brown [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Danny Garrett [R] |
Rep. Nathaniel Ledbetter [R] | Rep. Ed Oliver [R] | Rep. Rex Reynolds [R] | Rep. Matt Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - HBIR: Estes motion to Adopt Roll Call 93 (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-23 | House | Estes motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SB170 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Education Policy
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 41.1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 11 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 8 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |