AL HB338 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:50 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:50 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military service members, credit for professional business or licensing requirements based on military training and service, licenses remain in effect for military members while on active duty
Title
Military service members, credit for professional business or licensing requirements based on military training and service, licenses remain in effect for military members while on active duty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:50 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-350. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1088 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-04-04 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-04 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 273 |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 272 |
2013-04-04 | House | Lee Amendment Offered |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 271 |
2013-04-04 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment #2 Offered |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 270 |
2013-04-04 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment #1 Offered |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |