AL HB337 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2019 at 1:24 p.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2019 at 1:24 p.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, zoning in police jurisdiction, in counties where another municipality has zoning authority in police jurisdiction, authorized
Title
Municipalities, zoning in police jurisdiction, in counties where another municipality has zoning authority in police jurisdiction, authorized
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2019 at 1:24 p.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-251. |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 853 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 392 |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |