AL HB337 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic Examiners, State Board of, practice of chiropractic, licensure and regulation further provided for, permit holders, state at-large member, fingerprinting for applicants, exam for clinic permit applicants, subpoena power, judicial review, fees, unpaid checks, Sec. 34-24-162 added; Secs. 34-24-121, 34-24-123, 34-24-140, 34-24-143, 34-24-160, 34-24-161, 34-24-165, 34-24-166, 34-24-168, 34-24-170, 34-24-172, 34-24-175, 34-24-176 am'd.
Title
Chiropractic Examiners, State Board of, practice of chiropractic, licensure and regulation further provided for, permit holders, state at-large member, fingerprinting for applicants, exam for clinic permit applicants, subpoena power, judicial review, fees, unpaid checks, Sec. 34-24-162 added; Secs. 34-24-121, 34-24-123, 34-24-140, 34-24-143, 34-24-160, 34-24-161, 34-24-165, 34-24-166, 34-24-168, 34-24-170, 34-24-172, 34-24-175, 34-24-176 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-414. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1187 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |
2013-04-09 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 348 |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-09 | House | Knight motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 344 |
2013-04-09 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2013-04-09 | House | Wood motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-09 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |