AL HB336 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Delivered to Governor at 12:43 p.m. on March 31, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Delivered to Governor at 12:43 p.m. on March 31, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Plumbers and gas fitters, journeyman plumber replaced with a residential plumber as a member of the board, expand examination options for a journeyman plumber or gas fitter, definitions, Secs. 34-37-1, 34-37-3, 34-37-6 am'd.
Title
Plumbers and gas fitters, journeyman plumber replaced with a residential plumber as a member of the board, expand examination options for a journeyman plumber or gas fitter, definitions, Secs. 34-37-1, 34-37-3, 34-37-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Reynolds motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 820 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 826 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 825 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 824 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 541 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 540 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 539 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 826 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 825 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 824 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 541 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 540 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 539 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:43 p.m. on March 31, 2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-284. |
2022-03-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-31 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-03-31 | House | Reynolds motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 820 |
2022-03-31 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 826 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hatcher motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 825 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 541 |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 540 |
2022-03-09 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 37 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 37 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 37 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |