AL HB335 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax lien auctions and sales; auctions and fees further provided for; tax lien redemptions; tax lien price further provided for; redemption of tax lien further provided for; prohibit entry on land; penalties established
Title
Tax lien auctions and sales; auctions and fees further provided for; tax lien redemptions; tax lien price further provided for; redemption of tax lien further provided for; prohibit entry on land; penalties established
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 890 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 632 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 631 YIYM626-1 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 632 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 631 YIYM626-1 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-30 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 890 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 632 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 631 YIYM626-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered YIYM626-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Judiciary YIYM626-1 |
2024-04-03 | House | Judiciary 1st Amendment YIM7NNN-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |